LA SB341 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for performance audits for statutory dedications that include a fee for service. (gov sig) (EN +$16,000 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for performance audits for statutory dedications that include a fee for service. (gov sig) (EN +$16,000 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#1097) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 341 SB 341 BY DONAHUE (#57) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateEffective date 5/23/2018.
2018-05-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 530.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-15SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18.
2018-05-07HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-03HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-05-02HouseReported favorably (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-03-20HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-19HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-03-19SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-14SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-13SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2018-03-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB341&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072868
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074315
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097495
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102619
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072874
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074041
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075191
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075950
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098411
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102224
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076448
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097430

Bill Comments

feedback