LA SB34 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Removes bottle-size limitations on containers of wine shipped directly to consumers. (7/1/19) (OR NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes bottle-size limitations on containers of wine shipped directly to consumers. (7/1/19) (OR NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-23SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-03-20SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback