LA SB339 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a cosmetologist, esthetician, or manicurist in business for themselves or the cosmetology salon owner or mobile salon owner to register their business with the secretary of state. (8/1/22)
Title
Requires a cosmetologist, esthetician, or manicurist in business for themselves or the cosmetology salon owner or mobile salon owner to register their business with the secretary of state. (8/1/22)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 499. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported by substitute. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |