LA SB336 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the credit for the payment of noncommercial hunting and fishing license fees to certain military personnel. (EG DECREASE RV See Note)
Title
Expands the credit for the payment of noncommercial hunting and fishing license fees to certain military personnel. (EG DECREASE RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 336, FINAL PASSAGE (#291) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-22 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-21 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-19 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Natural Resources. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Natural Resources. |