LA SB33 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Names the LSU Health North Clinic and Urgent Care facility in Baton Rouge the "Willie F. Hawkins Emergency Care Center". (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Names the LSU Health North Clinic and Urgent Care facility in Baton Rouge the "Willie F. Hawkins Emergency Care Center". (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 33 FINAL PASSAGE (#1161) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 33 SB 33 BY COLOMB (#216) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateEffective date 5/23/2018.
2018-05-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 514.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-17SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-16SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-16HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18.
2018-05-11HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-10HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-05-08HouseReported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-03HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-03SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-28SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-27SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-02-21SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback