LA SB325 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to abortion clinics and services. (8/1/18) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to abortion clinics and services. (8/1/18) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 325 FINAL PASSAGE (#1175) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 325 FINAL PASSAGE (#655) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 325 AMENDMENT # 3547 BY MILKOVICH SB 325 BY MILKOVICH (#654) (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 325 FINAL PASSAGE (#655) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 325 AMENDMENT # 3547 BY MILKOVICH SB 325 BY MILKOVICH (#654) (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 564. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-10 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 3 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |