LA SB318 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for TOPS-Tech award eligibility for certain military veterans. (gov sig) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for TOPS-Tech award eligibility for certain military veterans. (gov sig) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 318 CO-AUTHORS (#264) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 318 FINAL PASSAGE (#263) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 318 REFER TO FINANCE (#241) (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-20SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-19SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-18SenateBy a vote of 28 yeas and 7 nays.
2020-05-18SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-14SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB318&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162668
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172424
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174002
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174677
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171015
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170138
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173923
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173941
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173922
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174433
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162669
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164882
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172573
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172515
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174257
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174396
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174823
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173730
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174608
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174610

Bill Comments

feedback