LA SB318 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 64-31-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for TOPS-Tech award eligibility for certain military veterans. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for TOPS-Tech award eligibility for certain military veterans. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors

Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]Sen. Mark Abraham [R]Sen. Louie Bernard [R]Sen. Troy Carter [D]
Sen. Heather Cloud [R]Sen. Patrick Connick [R]Sen. Cleo Fields [D]Sen. Franklin Foil [R]
Sen. Patrick McMath [R]Sen. Barry Milligan [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]Sen. John Morris [R]
Sen. Mike Reese [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Mack White [R]Sen. Glen Womack [R]
Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]
Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]
Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]
Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]
Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]
Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]Rep. Michael Echols [R]
Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Les Farnum [R]
Rep. Gabe Firment [R]Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]
Rep. Larry Frieman [R]Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Kyle Green [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]
Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]
Rep. John Illg [R]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]
Rep. Travis Johnson [D]Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]
Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]
Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Danny McCormick [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Scott McKnight [R]
Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]
Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]Rep. Richard Nelson [R]Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Charles Owen [R]
Rep. Robert Owen [R]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Neil Riser [R]
Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Larry Selders [D]Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]
Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]
Rep. Debbie Villio [R]Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]
Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]

Roll Calls

2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 318 FINAL PASSAGE (#587) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 318 CO-AUTHORS (#264) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 318 FINAL PASSAGE (#263) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 318 REFER TO FINANCE (#241) (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 225.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-29SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2020-05-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-05-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
2020-05-27HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-27HouseRules suspended.
2020-05-27HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-27HouseReported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-21HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-20SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-19SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-18SenateBy a vote of 28 yeas and 7 nays.
2020-05-18SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-14SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB318&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162668
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172424
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174002
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174677
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177539
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182003
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171015
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170138
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173923
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173941
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173922
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174433
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162669
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164882
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172573
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172515
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174257
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174396
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174823
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178281
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180133
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173730
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174608
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174610
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177460

Bill Comments

feedback