LA SB315 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Effective date 7/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Effective date 7/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to group purchasing and cooperative purchasing provisions of certain public postsecondary education institutions. (7/1/14). (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to group purchasing and cooperative purchasing provisions of certain public postsecondary education institutions. (7/1/14). (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 315 FINAL PASSAGE (#1261) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 315 FINAL PASSAGE (#504) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 315 FINAL PASSAGE (#504) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2014. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 700. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-05-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014. |
2014-05-14 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-13 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2014-05-12 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-04-24 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |