LA SB312 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Revises procedure regarding meetings to propose or renew taxes and to call an election. (8/1/18)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises procedure regarding meetings to propose or renew taxes and to call an election. (8/1/18)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 312 CONCUR (#1135) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House Vote on SB 312 FINAL PASSAGE (#1046) (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 312 FINAL PASSAGE (#270) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-25SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 486.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-15SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays.
2018-05-14SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-14HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 17. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-14HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18.
2018-05-11HouseNotice given.
2018-05-11HouseNotice removed
2018-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
2018-05-09HouseNotice given.
2018-05-07HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18.
2018-04-19HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-18HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-17HouseReported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-05HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-04SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-22SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-21SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB312&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072593
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077696
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083425
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097057
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102077
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077540
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079057
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087079
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087401
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093757
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096781
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072606
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078115
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083492
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101941
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083164
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096608
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096886

Bill Comments

feedback