LA SB311 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - Tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - Tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all softball and baseball dugouts used for high school interscholastic athletics be enclosed. (8/1/18) (EG INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Requires that all softball and baseball dugouts used for high school interscholastic athletics be enclosed. (8/1/18) (EG INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathan Perry [R] | Sen. Conrad Appel [R] | Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D] | Sen. John Milkovich [D] |
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] | Sen. Dan Morrish [R] | Sen. Michael Walsworth [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 LAY ON THE TABLE (#1089) (Y: 53 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4554 BY THIBAUT MOTION TO ADOPT (#1088) (Y: 63 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4552 BY WRIGHT MOTION TO ADOPT (#1087) (Y: 66 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4559 BY TALBOT MOTION TO ADOPT (#1086) (Y: 66 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4541 BY WHITE MOTION TO ADOPT (#1085) (Y: 62 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4543 BY SCHEXNAYDER MOTION TO ADOPT (#1084) (Y: 65 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4534 BY MILLER D. MOTION TO ADOPT (#1083) (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4532 BY POPE MOTION TO ADOPT (#1082) (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 311 FINAL PASSAGE (#144) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4554 BY THIBAUT MOTION TO ADOPT (#1088) (Y: 63 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4552 BY WRIGHT MOTION TO ADOPT (#1087) (Y: 66 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4559 BY TALBOT MOTION TO ADOPT (#1086) (Y: 66 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4541 BY WHITE MOTION TO ADOPT (#1085) (Y: 62 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4543 BY SCHEXNAYDER MOTION TO ADOPT (#1084) (Y: 65 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4534 BY MILLER D. MOTION TO ADOPT (#1083) (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 311 AMENDMENT # 4532 BY POPE MOTION TO ADOPT (#1082) (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 311 FINAL PASSAGE (#144) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Tabled. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-03 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-02 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-03-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |