LA SB3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: House Transportation, Highways and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides authority for the commissioner of the OMV to waive any penalty, procedure, or requirement for failure to maintain insurance provided that the principal driver of the motor vehicle is the registered owner or owner's spouse or child who was in the hospital or has died, and the owner can provide such proof to the commissioner. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides authority for the commissioner of the OMV to waive any penalty, procedure, or requirement for failure to maintain insurance provided that the principal driver of the motor vehicle is the registered owner or owner's spouse or child who was in the hospital or has died, and the owner can provide such proof to the commissioner. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 3 CO-AUTHORS (#109) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#108) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-23HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-23SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-22SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-17SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-02-06SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback