LA SB296 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to reimbursement for pharmacist clinical services in Louisiana's Medicaid program. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to reimbursement for pharmacist clinical services in Louisiana's Medicaid program. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |