LA SB282 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date 6/16/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date 6/16/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a workforce training initiative to serve public assistance recipients. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Establishes a workforce training initiative to serve public assistance recipients. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 282 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1672) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 282 ADOPT (#1394) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 282 REJECT (#595) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House Vote on SB 282 FINAL PASSAGE (#787) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 282 FINAL PASSAGE (#262) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 282 ADOPT (#1394) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 282 REJECT (#595) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House Vote on SB 282 FINAL PASSAGE (#787) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 282 FINAL PASSAGE (#262) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Effective date 6/16/2022. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 506. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2022-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2022-06-02 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Jackson, Luneau, and Morris. |
2022-05-31 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-05-25 | House | House conferees appointed: Travis Johnson, Carpenter, and Riser. |
2022-05-16 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |