LA SB276 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a fund to pay group insurance premiums for retired sheriffs and deputies in Plaquemines Parish. (8/15/10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Title
Creates a fund to pay group insurance premiums for retired sheriffs and deputies in Plaquemines Parish. (8/15/10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 276, FINAL PASSAGE (#1377) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 276, FINAL PASSAGE (#511) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 276, FINAL PASSAGE (#511) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-24 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 499. | |
2010-06-15 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-14 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-14 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2010. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2010-06-02 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-27 | Reported favorably (12-0-1) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2010-05-11 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-10 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-03 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |