LA SB257 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date 8/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date 8/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana State Board of Home Inspectors. (8/1/17) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana State Board of Home Inspectors. (8/1/17) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 257 FINAL PASSAGE (#754) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 257 SB 257 BY MORRELL (#477) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 257 SB 257 BY MORRELL (#477) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2017. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 328. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-05-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 205. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |