LA SB254 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for expansion of working conditions afforded to fire service employees employed by nonprofit corporations under contract with a fire protection district, municipality, or other political subdivision. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for expansion of working conditions afforded to fire service employees employed by nonprofit corporations under contract with a fire protection district, municipality, or other political subdivision. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 254 CO-AUTHORS (#93) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#92) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20.
2020-05-22HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-21HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2020-05-11SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-03-16SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-11SenateReported favorably.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2020-02-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback