LA SB252 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to provide, with certain exemptions, for a state minimum wage effective August 1, 2019. (2/3 - CA13sl(A)) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Constitutional amendment to provide, with certain exemptions, for a state minimum wage effective August 1, 2019. (2/3 - CA13sl(A)) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |