LA SB252 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the allocation of the local avails of the automobile rental tax. (gov sig) (EN -$14,500 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the allocation of the local avails of the automobile rental tax. (gov sig) (EN -$14,500 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 252 CONCUR (#898) (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 252 FINAL PASSAGE (#730) (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 252 FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 252 FINAL PASSAGE (#730) (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 252 FINAL PASSAGE (#268) (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/23/2017. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 397. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 25 yeas and 10 nays. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 38. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/17. |
2017-05-30 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2017-05-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |