LA SB248 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the legislative auditor to audit certain capital outlay procedures. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Requires the legislative auditor to audit certain capital outlay procedures. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Glen Womack [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 248 FINAL PASSAGE (#368) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |