LA SB246 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the creation of an international language immersion school. (8/1/21)
Title
Provides relative to the creation of an international language immersion school. (8/1/21)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#808) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#367) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#367) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2021. |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 110. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2021-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 117. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |