LA SB241 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 2/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 2/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the Small Business Protection Act. (2/1/20)
Title
Provides for the Small Business Protection Act. (2/1/20)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#730) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#730) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#271) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#730) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 241 FINAL PASSAGE (#271) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 2/1/2020. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 204. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2019-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 208. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |