LA SB23 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the interchange of I-49 Exit 11 and Louisiana Highway 93 near Sunset and Grand Coteau in St. Landry Parish as the "Armand J. Brinkhaus Memorial Interchange". (8/1/18)
Title
Designates the interchange of I-49 Exit 11 and Louisiana Highway 93 near Sunset and Grand Coteau in St. Landry Parish as the "Armand J. Brinkhaus Memorial Interchange". (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House Vote on SB 23 FINAL PASSAGE (#696) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 23 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 23 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 218. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18. |
2018-04-18 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |