LA SB229 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the creation, dedication, use, and investment of the Health Care Employment Reinvestment Opportunity (H.E.R.O.) Fund. (8/1/21) (EN NO IMPACT SD EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the creation, dedication, use, and investment of the Health Care Employment Reinvestment Opportunity (H.E.R.O.) Fund. (8/1/21) (EN NO IMPACT SD EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#791) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 229 CO-AUTHORS (#286) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#285) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04SenateEffective date 8/1/2021.
2021-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 109.
2021-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2021-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2021-05-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-19HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-18HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-17HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-06HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-06SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-04SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-03SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2021-04-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB229&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212394
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219814
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229678
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232842
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219637
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219785
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212397
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214495
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220734
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220970
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232540
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235615
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221828
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221829
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229227

Bill Comments

feedback