LA SB229 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for continued collection of certain sales taxes within corporate limits of any municipality incorporated after a certain date. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for continued collection of certain sales taxes within corporate limits of any municipality incorporated after a certain date. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#783) (Y: 58 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 229 AMENDMENT # 3537 BY MARCELLE MOTION TO ADOPT (#782) (Y: 31 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 229 AMENDMENT # 3533 BY JAMES MOTION TO ADOPT (#781) (Y: 34 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#368) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 229 AMENDMENT # 2004 BY WHITE SB 229 BY CLAITOR (#367) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-31SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-05-31HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 25. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-31HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-31HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/31/19.
2019-05-28HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-23HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-22HouseReported favorably (11-5). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-05-16HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-15SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-15SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-05-15SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-05-15SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted.
2019-05-14SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-13SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB229&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124894
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133133
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134674
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140479
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133096
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133170
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134612
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134618
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134237
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134637
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140288
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140222
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140198
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140004
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140299
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140297
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124895
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132220
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134116
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134390
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134824
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136142
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142439
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145076
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145452
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134653
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140357

Bill Comments

feedback