LA SB226 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 13. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for tax exemptions for special districts created to finance capital improvements. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for tax exemptions for special districts created to finance capital improvements. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 226 FINAL PASSAGE (#595) (Y: 66 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 226 FINAL PASSAGE (#214) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 13. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-23HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-23HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-13HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-09HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-08HouseReported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-05-01HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-01SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-29SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-15SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback