LA SB224 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the individual income tax credit for donations to school tuition organizations. (1/1/20) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the individual income tax credit for donations to school tuition organizations. (1/1/20) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-04-23SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-22SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback