LA SB224 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires instruction and display of the national motto "In God We Trust" in public schools. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires instruction and display of the national motto "In God We Trust" in public schools. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#880) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#369) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateEffective date 5/23/2018.
2018-05-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 410.
2018-05-15SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-14SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-09HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18.
2018-04-27HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-26HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-25HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-04-12HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-11SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-10SenateRead by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-09SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-03-27SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2018-03-26SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB224&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070663
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078336
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084346
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085640
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096138
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101373
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078055
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084170
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070667
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076251
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079819
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079903
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085036
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085265
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085768
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085114
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098725
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101430
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085520
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095101

Bill Comments

feedback