LA SB223 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-22 - Effective date 6/22/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to state income taxation of Subchapter S corporations and other flow through entities. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to state income taxation of Subchapter S corporations and other flow through entities. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 223 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1029) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 223 ADOPT (#995) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 223 REJECT (#934) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 223 FINAL PASSAGE (#840) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 223 FINAL PASSAGE (#464) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-22SenateEffective date 6/22/2019.
2019-06-22SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 442.
2019-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
2019-06-06HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-05HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/06/19.
2019-06-05HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-05HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2019-06-05SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Stefanski, Abramson, and DeVillier.
2019-06-04HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-04SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Allain, and Donahue.
2019-06-04SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-06-03SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-06-02HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-06-02HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-30HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/02/19.
2019-05-30HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-29HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-28HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-23HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-05-23SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-23SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-05-08SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-05-07SenateRead by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-06SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-29SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB223&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123634
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128485
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143464
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144974
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126878
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141363
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141579
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123635
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128160
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129390
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129755
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143109
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144007
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145060
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137192
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141421
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142327
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143161
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143419

Bill Comments

feedback