LA SB223 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the use of electronic prescribing. (gov sig)
Title
Allows the use of electronic prescribing. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-13 - House - House Vote on SB 223, FINAL PASSAGE (#562) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 223, FINAL PASSAGE (#94) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 223, FINAL PASSAGE (#94) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Effective date 8/15/11. | |
2011-06-24 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 155. | |
2011-06-16 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-16 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-15 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-14 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-13 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/13/2011. | |
2011-06-06 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-02 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-01 | Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2011-05-10 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-09 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-05 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Health and Welfare. |