LA SB222 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for licensure procedures for early childhood learning centers. (1/1/14) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for licensure procedures for early childhood learning centers. (1/1/14) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 222 CONCUR (#817) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 222 FINAL PASSAGE (#677) (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 222 FINAL PASSAGE (#265) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-07SenateEffective date 1/1/2014.
2013-06-07SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 179.
2013-06-03SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2013-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2013-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2013-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
2013-05-31SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2013-05-30SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2013-05-29SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2013-05-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 16. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2013-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013.
2013-05-23HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-05-22HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2013-05-21HouseReported with amendments (8-2) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-05-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2013-05-07HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2013-05-06SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-05-06SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2013-04-29SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2013-04-25SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-04-24SenateReported with amendments.
2013-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2013-03-29SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=SB222&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=835721
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841627
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=845191
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=853527
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=857675
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841006
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=842210
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=843440
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=843517
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=848929
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=848738
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=847637
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=849815
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=849720
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=850093
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=851534
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=850128
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=852251
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=852743
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=835722
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=842119
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=842412
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=845281
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=849486
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=849808
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=854329
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=856241
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=845080
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=852619
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=853368

Bill Comments

feedback