LA SB222 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 57. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 57. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the relationship of automobile manufacturers and dealers. (8/15/10)
Title
Provides relative to the relationship of automobile manufacturers and dealers. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 222, FINAL PASSAGE (#1519) (Y: 34 N: 57 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on SB 222, AMENDMENT B-505, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1518) (Y: 49 N: 36 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on SB 222, AMENDMENT B-496, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1517) (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 222, AMENDMENT B-489, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1516) (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 222, FINAL PASSAGE (#628) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 222, AMENDMENT B-505, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1518) (Y: 49 N: 36 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on SB 222, AMENDMENT B-496, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1517) (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 222, AMENDMENT B-489, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1516) (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 222, FINAL PASSAGE (#628) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 34, nays 57. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2010. | |
2010-06-04 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-03 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-02 | Reported with amendments (8-5) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-18 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-05-17 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-17 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-17 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-03 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-04-29 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-28 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |