LA SB220 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for eligibility for parole consideration for certain offenders. (8/15/11)
Title
Provides for eligibility for parole consideration for certain offenders. (8/15/11)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 220, SB 220 BY MARTINY (#339) (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2011-06-01 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | |
2011-06-01 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 21 nays. | |
2011-06-01 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-05-31 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2011-05-25 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-24 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary B. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary B. |