LA SB217 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts the refundable portion of the child tax credit from seizure. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts the refundable portion of the child tax credit from seizure. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 217 FINAL PASSAGE (#230) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-21HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-20HouseReported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-05-02HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-02SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-01SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-30SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback