LA SB215 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date 6/14/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date 6/14/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the enrollment procedures of certain charter schools.
Title
Provides relative to the enrollment procedures of certain charter schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 215 CONCUR (#785) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#672) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#255) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#672) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#255) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | Effective date 6/14/2017. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 253. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-05-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |