LA SB214 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Department of Economic Development and the Board of Commerce and Industry. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to the Department of Economic Development and the Board of Commerce and Industry. (gov sig)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |