LA SB204 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for live racing dates and minimum number of races per day to be assigned by the Louisiana State Racing Commission. (7/1/21)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for live racing dates and minimum number of races per day to be assigned by the Louisiana State Racing Commission. (7/1/21)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 204 CONCUR (#989) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 204 FINAL PASSAGE (#1030) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 204 FINAL PASSAGE (#359) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21SenateEffective date: See Act.
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 436.
2021-06-10SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-09SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays.
2021-06-07SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-06-07HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021.
2021-06-01HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-27HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-26HouseReported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2021-05-12HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-12SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-12SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2021-05-10SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2021-05-05SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-04SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2021-04-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB204&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212088
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220408
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233586
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235892
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220352
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220224
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228560
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228112
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212092
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221421
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228568
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233033
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235984
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224125
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232476
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233418

Bill Comments 750

feedback