LA SB203 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an individual income tax return checkoff for donations to the Louisiana Food Bank Association. (gov sig) (EG1 NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Title
Creates an individual income tax return checkoff for donations to the Louisiana Food Bank Association. (gov sig) (EG1 NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 203, SB 203 BY PETERSON (#58) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Reported favorably (21-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-07 | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-06-06 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-05-05 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-05-04 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-04 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-03 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-02 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |