LA SB20 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Office of Workers' Compensation Administrative Fund. (Item #11) (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Office of Workers' Compensation Administrative Fund. (Item #11) (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 20 CONCUR (#89) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#67) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#33) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#67) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 20 FINAL PASSAGE (#33) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2018. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 12. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018. |
2018-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-06-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/18. |
2018-06-03 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-06-03 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-06-03 | House | Reported favorably (12-7). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-31 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |