LA SB2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Designates a portion of LA 25 in Washington Parish as the "Jerry Joe Rayburn Memorial Highway". (8/1/19) (EG +$1,100 SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of LA 25 in Washington Parish as the "Jerry Joe Rayburn Memorial Highway". (8/1/19) (EG +$1,100 SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#68) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-16SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-01-29SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback