LA SB198 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for administration, disposition, enforcement, and adjudication of state and local taxes and for the Board of Tax Appeals. (gov sig) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for administration, disposition, enforcement, and adjudication of state and local taxes and for the Board of Tax Appeals. (gov sig) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 198 FINAL PASSAGE (#61) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-04-17HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-16SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-10SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-09SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB198&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122105
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123439
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125064
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123218
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123661
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122108
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123386
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123797
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124236
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125186
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126461
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124994

Bill Comments

feedback