LA SB19 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to partition of immovable property under certain circumstances. (8/1/21)
Title
Provides relative to partition of immovable property under certain circumstances. (8/1/21)
Sponsors
Sen. John Morris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |