LA SB188 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the bonding authority of the Greater Lafourche Port Commission. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the bonding authority of the Greater Lafourche Port Commission. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 188 FINAL PASSAGE (#126) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-23SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-22SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB188&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122036
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125953
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127247
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126195
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122039
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123870
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126673
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126880
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127347
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126842
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127179

Bill Comments

feedback