LA SB186 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-05 - Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to public adjuster fees. (1/1/23)
Title
Provides relative to public adjuster fees. (1/1/23)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 186 2/3 vote (#1381) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 186 AMENDMENT # 5281 BY FIRMENT MOTION TO ADOPT (#1474) (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 186 AMENDMENT # 5281 BY FIRMENT MOTION TO ADOPT (#1474) (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-05 | House | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported with amendments (6-2-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-05-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |