LA SB186 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Effective date 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Effective date 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Municipal and Traffic Court of New Orleans. (gov sig) (EN -$32,500 LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Municipal and Traffic Court of New Orleans. (gov sig) (EN -$32,500 LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#525) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#204) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 186 FINAL PASSAGE (#204) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 6/4/2020. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-21 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |