LA SB18 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date 6/4/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date 6/4/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the reemployment of retirees. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for the reemployment of retirees. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 18 FINAL PASSAGE (#742) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 18 FINAL PASSAGE (#36) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 18 FINAL PASSAGE (#36) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 6/4/2021. |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 55. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-17 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-04-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |