LA SB18 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-15 - Scheduled for floor debate on 10/19/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an exemption to certain permit fees collected by the Office of Alcohol and Tobacco Control. (gov sig) (Item #35) (RE DECREASE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides an exemption to certain permit fees collected by the Office of Alcohol and Tobacco Control. (gov sig) (Item #35) (RE DECREASE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 18 FINAL PASSAGE (#47) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/19/20.
2020-10-15HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-15HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-15HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-10-15HouseReported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2020-10-07SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-10-06SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-09-28SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=SB18&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189216
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191064
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191545
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190683
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189595
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191277
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191055
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189218
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189580
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191196
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191403
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191581
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191689
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191531

Bill Comments

feedback