LA SB177 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 5/20/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the legislative auditor to obtain certain information about employees with access to federal tax records of auditees. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the legislative auditor to obtain certain information about employees with access to federal tax records of auditees. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 177 CONCUR (#1087) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 177 FINAL PASSAGE (#878) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 177 FINAL PASSAGE (#294) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-20SenateEffective date 5/20/2018.
2018-05-20SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 363.
2018-05-16SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-14SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2018-05-14SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-05-11SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-09HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18.
2018-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-26HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-25HouseReported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-09HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-09SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-27SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-26SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2018-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB177&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1069972
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078829
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095879
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101112
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078539
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090360
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095322
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1069974
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078218
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079811
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079879
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097041
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084343
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095099
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096565

Bill Comments

feedback