LA SB176 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Blind Persons' Literacy Rights and Education Act. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Amends the Blind Persons' Literacy Rights and Education Act. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Cleo Fields [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 176 FINAL PASSAGE (#1214) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 176 FINAL PASSAGE (#99) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 176 FINAL PASSAGE (#95) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 176 FINAL PASSAGE (#99) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 176 FINAL PASSAGE (#95) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Effective date 6/10/2022. |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 302. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2022. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-12 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-11 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-04-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and withdrawn. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |