LA SB172 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
Pending: House Civil Law and Procedure Committee
Hearing: May 28 @ 10:00 am in Room 4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Mandates the minimum age for marriage shall be 16 years of age. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandates the minimum age for marriage shall be 16 years of age. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#392) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-05-21HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-20SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 15 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-15SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback